Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Morgan, Deborah, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC The file is in transit to the Record Center Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO KASS SHULER P.A. mas Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL ret of orig doc mary ann Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.