Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
J D Welding And Fabrication Inc, Dorman, Jacqueline M, filed a(n) Civil case against Dorman, Jeffry C, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CD612 - JUDGMENT OF DISM (AFTER HRG).. 7-14-11 JDA. USER ID=DLORETOSU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION JULY 14.2011 @ 3:00 PM ROOM 514, JUDGE ARNOLD. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED EX PAWN. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR MODIFYING INJUNCTION ORDER 03/18/09 JDA. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 2/25/09 9:30 AM. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR GRANTING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 1-09-09 JDA. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 1/7/09 JEFFRY C DORMAN. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JEFFRY DORMAN. USER ID=MCBRIDEKA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED C1. USER ID=ANDERSOD Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.