Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stapleton, Scott, Stapleton, Janie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Potter, Charlene, Ari Fleet Lc, Automotive Rentals Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Levens, P. William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ 10/09/09 WPL. USER ID=DLORETOSU Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 06/25/09 X5. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE USER ID=BUCHANANN Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE GREGORY BLACKBURN. USER ID=BUCHANANN Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET TRIAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Levens, P. William |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Levens, P. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.