Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Julien, Marie Anne, Julien, Lafontant, Providence Lakes Master Assn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED CURRENT OCCUPANT. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED HCSO CK 937680. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT ROPEN - CASE REOPENED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION 12/6/10 JRP. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.