Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Rizo Obando, Carlos, Rizo, Lorna, Barroso, Pedro, Barroso, Amanda, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE CARLOS RIZO-OBANDO Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE JANE DOE NKA AMANDA BARROSO Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE JOHN DOE NKA PEDRO BARROSO Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.