Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bac Home Loans, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Romero, Gabriel V, Romero, Georgina M, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in transit to the Record Center Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.