Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Tarazona, Juan, Tarazona, Nally, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, Summerfield Master Community Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BEFORE HEARING Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE CIRCUIT CIVIL NEW DISPOSAL IN TRANSIT TO RC Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL- FOR PLTF- GRANTED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.