Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Companymaria Mignosa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mestre, Ivonne, Ortiz-Mestre, Sue Ellen, Eastshore Palms Hoa Inc, Anti-Pesto Bugkillers Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc1901 E Voorhees St., Ste. C, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Arnold, D. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 16-NOV-2009,$70.00, User Id = CARDINEZA, Receipt No = 1700810. USER ID=CARDINEZA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION DOS 11/16/09. USER ID=CARDINEZA Judge: Arnold, D. James |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE USER ID=DAVISCR Judge: Arnold, D. James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.