Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Financial System Florida, Incc O Corporation Service Co, R.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Deal, Molly B, Deal, John Joseph, Deal, David Franklin, Charlton, Molly Hurley, Rosenberger, Tammy Deal, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Sabella, C. Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT CHECK # 60246 Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE. USER ID=MCBRIDEKA Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE USER ID=TUCKERTO Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING USER ID=TUCKERTO Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.