Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Companymaria Mignosa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Foreclosure Solutions Llc, Jack, Jennifer, Lyn-Fatt, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Sabella, C. Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ALBERTELL LAW. USER ID=VECSEY Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=CUSHMAN Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF THE LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE 10-21-08 FAG. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Sabella, C. Christopher |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.