Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Secretary Of Veterans Affairs, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Garcia, Geraldo, Garcia, Amarilis, Copper Ridge Brandon Hoa Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File Returning to R/C; Boxed in p/u area 12/04/13 to be picked up Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Linda Lewis - Redact Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.