Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bobo, Ralph, Bobo, Michelle, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Citizens Property Insurance Corp, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2002 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File is in transit to the Record Center Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN REQUESTING DEPT - CIRCUIT CIVIL
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - SEND TO CIRCUIT CIVIL Emily "To Be Redacted" Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO HOME LOCATION - RC File in transit to the Record Center Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEW VOLUME MADE VOLUME #8 - DATE OF 1ST PLEADING 11/28/07 "TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL (VOLUME V)" Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEW VOLUME MADE VOLUME #9 - DATE OF 1ST PLEADING 11/28/07 "TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL (VOLUME VIII OF VIII) Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEW VOLUME MADE VOLUME #7 - DATE OF 1ST PLEADING 11/28/07 "TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL (VOLUME III)" Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO CIRCUIT CIVIL - NEW VOLUMES HAS TO BE MADE Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.