Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Obi , Valeria I., against Velazquez, Jesus, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Hooi, Michael. J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1805;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/21A1901A-Faba-496B-9275-80Dd5B8890Fb/Results/49B5812E-29E4-4794-A3D7-635Dbe9B18F5/Lines/2Bfb15E2-B741-4233-B106-Fd8A5853A0F6/Disposition_Html |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: July 26, 2022DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: September 08, 2022REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 20, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: June 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS
Date: September 08, 2022DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: July 28, 2022DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: July 28, 2022E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 22, 202120 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: April 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: January 20, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK DUE TO DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED (7/28/2022) |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.