Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Veros Credit, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Beinhaker , Drew, against Swan-Thurston, Raymond Edward, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Costello, Jessica presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 27, 2022NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: May 04, 2022FINAL ORDER
Date: June 17, 2022ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: May 04, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2021WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED
Date: May 06, 2022WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED
Date: April 25, 2022COURT TICKET
Date: April 19, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: December 01, 2021STIPULATION
Date: April 27, 2021E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 22, 2022DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: February 02, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE
Date: April 26, 2022MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: April 19, 2021E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Date: January 22, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE
Date: June 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 |
FINAL ORDER IN GARNISHMENT |
||
June 16, 2022 | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE | ||
May 27, 2022 | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | ||
May 06, 2022 |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED G.A. NICHOLS COMPANY, 5/4/2022 |
||
May 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT | ||
April 26, 2022 |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE WOCGI DREW@HENSCHELANDBEINHAKER |
||
April 25, 2022 |
WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED 4/25/22 JC DREW@HENSCHELANDBEINHAKER |
||
April 22, 2022 | E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | ||
December 06, 2021 | DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT | ||
December 01, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.