Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gale Force Roofing And Restoration, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bailie , Jeremy David, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Boydstun , C Bryant, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Barbas, Rex presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbas, Rex Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in Hillsborough County, Florida. The plaintiff, Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, ...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: January 20, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 20, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 20, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Date: April 20, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 20, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 27, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 11, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 11, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 07, 2021DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: December 01, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: January 11, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 04, 2021E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | ||
December 01, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
September 07, 2021 | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | ||
September 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | ||
August 11, 2021 |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION Steven Simpson |
||
July 13, 2021 | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | ||
June 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | ||
June 11, 2021 | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | ||
June 04, 2021 | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | ||
May 27, 2021 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.