Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Valdes, Rosa H, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Anderson, Greg, Becton, Danny, Bowman, Aaron, Boyer, Lori N, City Of Tampa Bob Buckhorn, (total of 28) See All in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Superior Courts with Thomas, Cheryl. K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas, Cheryl. K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a motion for clarification filed by Rosa H. Valdes against the State of Florida, Duval County Commissioners, Duval County City Council, Duval County Mayor Lenny Curry, Hillsborough County Commissioners, and Hillsborough County Mayor...
MOTION
Date: June 26, 2019MOTION
Date: May 16, 2019ORDER FROM DCA
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION
Date: May 16, 2019MOTION TO - FOR
Date: May 22, 2019MOTION TO - FOR
Date: May 22, 2019ORDER FROM DCA
Date: May 10, 2019LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL
Date: May 09, 2019ORDER GRANTING
Date: April 25, 2019ORDER GRANTING
Date: April 25, 2019ORDER ON - TO - FOR
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF FINAL APPEAL TO 2ND DCA
Date: May 08, 2019ORDER FROM DCA
Date: June 27, 2019ORDER FROM DCA
Date: July 19, 2019MOTION TO AMEND
Date: May 17, 2019MOTION
Date: May 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE
Date: May 13, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 07, 2019MOTION
Date: February 05, 2019MOTION TO - FOR
Date: January 29, 2019MOTION TO - FOR
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 22, 2019DOCUMENTS FILED
Date: January 22, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 29, 2019DOCUMENTS FILED
Date: April 22, 2019CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT
Date: May 08, 2019REQUEST
Date: April 17, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE
Date: May 28, 2019DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK
Date: May 10, 2019ORDER GRANTING
Date: March 29, 2019MOTION TO - FOR
Date: March 26, 2019RESPONSE
Date: April 09, 2019REQUEST
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NO SUBPOENAS ATTACHED
Date: April 04, 2019MOTION
Date: April 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 201920 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 21, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 22, 2019OBJECTION AND MOTION
Date: March 21, 2019MOTION
Date: March 15, 2019CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 07, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 21, 2019PETITION
Date: February 12, 2019ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: May 14, 2019WRIT
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: May 16, 2019MOTION
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: January 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: January 03, 2019CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT
Date: December 21, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED
Date: April 08, 2019INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 07, 2019MOTION
Date: March 15, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 21, 2018RESPONSE
Date: April 09, 2019DOCUMENTS FILED
Date: January 22, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2018CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 03, 2019DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 06, 2019DOCUMENTS FILED
Date: January 22, 2019CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 07, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 08, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 06/27/19 2D19-1775 ORDER NOW FINAL Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 2D19-1775 Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION /PETITION TO ENTER GROUNDS FOR GOOD CAUSE Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM DCA 2D19-1775 Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE KNOWLEDGE Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR ORDED SEALED DOCUMENTS Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR ORDER AMICUS CURIAE Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND
Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION (PETITION) FOR CLARIFICATION Judge: Thomas, Cheryl. K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.