Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Jimenez-Banuelos, Maria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sanchez-Jimenez, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated Event DV COURT on 2/15/2024 0830 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 2/15/2024 | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED 2/5/24 @ 2:30PM | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PET'S MOTION TO CHANGE THE TIME | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CHANGE THE TIME | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: BEATO , HEATHER assigned | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 282024DR000124FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/2/2024 | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Event DV COURT scheduled on 2/15/2024 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.