Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Williams, Kayleana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Dustin, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | TRANSFER RECEIPT | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Event DV COURT scheduled on 2/15/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Active Process ORDER TO APPEAR FOR INJUNCTION HEARING | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDCE WITH BREVARD COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURTS/TRANSFER TRIP | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED ON 11/20/2023 AT 8:20 AM | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: BEATO , HEATHER assigned | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 282024DR000109FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2024 | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE DOCKET - BREVARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.