Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jackson, Janet Wohlert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez, Felix, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ( FIVE YEARS 1/18/2029) | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated Event DV COURT on 1/18/2024 0830 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 1/18/2024 | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED 1/17/24 @ 7:41AM | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: BEATO , HEATHER assigned | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 282024DR000051FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/16/2024 | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Event DV COURT scheduled on 1/18/2024 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Active Process ORDER TO APPEAR FOR INJUNCTION HEARING | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | PRO SE LITIGANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.