Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Knox, Steffanie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kiker, Christopher Coy, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated Event DV COURT on 2/1/2024 0900 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 2/1/2024 | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT (CHRISTOPHER) | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMO FOR SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT (NK) | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING (4/6/2032) | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Event DV COURT scheduled on 2/1/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Petitioner Attorney: JEANETTE CRISTINA ABUCHAIBE Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated Event DV COURT on 1/18/2024 0830 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 1/18/2024 | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.