Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
J Michael Swaine, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2024 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | WILL FILED* 1ST CODICIL DATED 6/14/2011 | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT assigned | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 282024CP000078WLAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/7/2024 | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | WILL FILED* DATED 2/20/2002 | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | WILL FILED* 2 CODICIL DATED 6/2/2021 | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.