Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cefaratti, D Philip, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2024 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 275406 | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 282024CP000006PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/4/2024 | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE* 1/27/2009 DONALD CEFARATTI | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE* 6/23/2011 LUCIA MARIE CEFARATTI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.