Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dombroski, Jessey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dombroski, Harley, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRO SE COURT on 7/11/2023 0940 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results DISPOSED on 7/11/2023 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BEATO , HEATHER assigned | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 282023DR000572FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2023 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 no longer eligible for collections | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.