Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Smith, Breeana Joy, The Florida Department Of Reve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stevenson, Jamal Ashanti Qurne, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED STATEMENT OR FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY SENT TO FL DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION D T SCHEDULED ON 11/01/23 @1:00 PM | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT (10/09/23) | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event FAMHEAR scheduled on 10/9/2023 at 0845 AM, VC - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event FAMHEAR on 10/9/2023 0845 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 10/9/2023 | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (10/9/23 8:45AM) - VIRTUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.