Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hardin, Linda K, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWARD, DAVID VINCENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2023 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE* 07/06/2023 | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR LODGED WILL* ADAMS COUNTY COLORADO COMBINED COURT DATED 08/02/2023 | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL RECEIPT FOR LODGED WILL* ADAMS COUNTY COLORADO COMBINED COURT DATED 08/02/2023 | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR TRANSFER OF LODGED WILL (CERTIFIED)* ADAMS COUNTY COLORADO COMBINED COURT DATED 10/26/2023 | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT* DATED 08/25/2016 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 272438 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Beneficiary Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.