Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Moran, Thomas D Iii filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWARD, DAVID VINCENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 272430 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND* CHARLENE ANNE CARTER | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JOCELYN K SKIPPER ESQ | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE* DATED 10/05/2023 | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT* DATED 08/27/1999 | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 282023CP000554PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2023 | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.