Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Felicetti, Joan F filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND* STEVEN J FELICETTI | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND* MICHAEL N FELICETTI | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE* 04/03/2023 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT* DATED 10/25/2017 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 259285 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Petitioner Attorney: MICHAEL L KEIBER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.