Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ward, David Vincent filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with WARD, DAVID VINCENT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM THOMAS J WOHL ESQ | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE* 03/24/2023 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 282023CP000210PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2023 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 258605 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE *3/24/2023 | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE *BARBARA WELLS | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.