Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Begin, Jamie Charles, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $16.00 | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $16.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 201591 | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRO SE COURT on 11/30/2020 1030 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results DISPOSED on 12/1/2020 | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT. COPIES SENT TO THE FDLE AND DEPT. OF HEALTH | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | BIRTH CERTIFICATE FILED - JAMIE | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF FJ OF ADULT NAME CHANGE (FC 20-432) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.