Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carter, Sheila Ann, filed a(n) Products Liability case represented by Wikgren, Brent Scott, against Fca Us Llc Co Ct Corporation S, represented by Glenn, John Jason, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2016 |
CategoryProducts Liability |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | FCA LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING FCA US LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Wilnar Jeanne Julmiste Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: John Jason Glenn Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER -DEF FCA US LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT (ATTY JULMISTE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.