Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Graves, Ann Carter, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case against The Community Sons Of The Divi, Graves, Robert L Iii, represented by Martin, Stephanie M, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with David V. Ward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MGN HRG-GC on 2/27/2019 0931 AM Judge DAVID WARD results DISPOSED on 2/27/2019 | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CASE DISMISSED) | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE FROM PLTF | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MGN HRG-GC on 2/27/2019 0930 AM Judge LARRY HELMS results ERROR on 2/27/2019 | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGN HRG-GC scheduled on 2/27/2019 at 0931 AM, MX - Judge LARRY HELMS presiding. | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE (CMC SET FOR 2/27/2019 @ 9:30 AM) | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGN HRG-GC scheduled on 2/27/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge LARRY HELMS presiding. | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.