Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ike, Richard J Jr, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Diez-Arguelles, Carlos Raul, against Sf Lake Placid Llc, represented by Barna, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with David V. Ward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (6/25/20 @ 1:30PM) | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF W/DRAWAL OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL (ATTY KILBERT) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION (PRETRIAL 6/25/20 @ 1:30PM; JURY TRIAL 7/13/20 @ 9:00AM) | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO CONT' TRIAL AND ORDER CANCELLING AND RESETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL (PRE-TRIAL 6/25/2020 @ 1:30PM; JURY TRIAL 7/13/2020 @ 9:00AM) | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Event JURY TRIAL scheduled on 7/13/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAVID WARD presiding. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 6/25/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DAVID WARD presiding. | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated Event JURY TRIAL on 10/14/2019 0900 AM Judge DAVID WARD results CANCELLED on 7/15/2019 | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 9/26/2019 0130 PM Judge DAVID WARD results CANCELLED on 7/15/2019 | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ***PROPOSED EPORTALED COPY OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL***PROPOSED** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.