Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Romera, Suzanne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Romano, John Fletcher, against Auto Owners Insurance Company,, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (BEFORE HEARING) | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (BEFORE HEARING) | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA NONSERVED (FL FARM BUREAU INS CO) | |
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | PL SUZANNE ROMERA RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FR | |
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NONPARTY/REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | PLTS SUZANNE ROMERA RESPONSE TO DEFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PL ANSWERS TO DEF INTERROGATORIES | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY (FL FARM BUREAU INS CO) | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DEF'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFS AUTO OWNERS NOTICE OF SERVING OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.