Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hodge, Alfred, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Grizzard, Robert Harold, against City Of Avon Park,, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (8/22/2012-10:00) | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED 01/03/11 (CITY OF AVON PARK) CORP | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | PAYMENT OF $410.00 RECEIVED | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE LABEL | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO (CITY OF AVON PARK) | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.