Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
G&K Services Co,, filed a(n) General Court Other case represented by Avrutis, Thomas Lee, against Avon Park Chevrolet,, Nolette, Joseph H, in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2007 |
CategoryGeneral Court Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (JOSEPH NOLETTE) | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (JOSEPH NOLETTE) | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | DEF AVON PARK CHEVROLET PRELIMINARY WITNESS LIST | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO 09/08/09 1:00PM | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DISCOVERY DEPO (MICHAEL MANCUSO) UNSERVED | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION SEPT 8, 2009 1PM | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (9/23/091:00) | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DISCOVERY DEPOSITION 1/30/09 10:30 AM MICHAEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.