Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Collins, Amber Rain, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Jonathan Clair, in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts with BARBEE, DON JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | DV ORDER - RETURNED SERVED-1/20/24 | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Event DV scheduled on 2/21/2024 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding. | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF LESLIE SAMMIS OBO RESPONDENT | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT WORKSHEET - CONT TO 02/21/24 @10 | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED CONTINUING HEARING AND EXT TEMP INJ TO 02/21/24 @10 | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 272024DR000073DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2024 | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.