Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Paye, Angela, against Shannon, Brandon, Shannon, Jacqueline Marie, Shannon, Lizzy, Slavin, Colleen Marie, Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantee, (total of 8) See All represented by Neuman, Rod Barrett, in the jurisdiction of Hernando County, FL, . Hernando County, FL Superior Courts with VERGARA, PAMELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVERGARA, PAMELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHernando County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2
Date: December 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 NKA LIZZY SHANNON 121319
Date: December 24, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- PLEADINGS@LYONSLAWGROUP.COM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE MARIE SHANNON AKA JACQUELINE SHANNON
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ANGELA C PAYE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR PLNTF
Date: February 05, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: January 30, 2020ORDER FILED APPOINTING ROD B NEUMAN ESQ AS GAL FO RUNKNOWN HEIRS DTD 011320
Date: January 13, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1
Date: December 06, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: December 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE MARIE SHANNON AKA JACQUELINE SHANNON (BLANK)
Date: December 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH - UNKNOWN HEIRS
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER BY COLLEEN MARIE SLAVIN-MESZAROS
Date: January 02, 2020ORDER FILED STAYING PROCEEDING DUE TO CARES ACT DTD 030521
Date: March 05, 2021ANSWER AND REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM, GAL AND ADMIN AD LITEM, ROD B NEUMAN ESQ FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS
Date: February 13, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY W/ COURT ORDER DATED 112320 FILED BY PLNTF
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER FILED SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM ON 030521 AT 3:45 DTD 021221
Date: February 15, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, COLLEEN MARIE SLAVIN
Date: August 31, 2020EXHIBITS - - ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONF VIA ZOOM
Date: February 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF
Date: September 11, 2020PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST AND INTENT TO USE SUMMARY
Date: September 13, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY W/ COURT ORDER DATED 100520 (SECOND) FILED BY PLNTF
Date: October 20, 2020ORDER FILED SETTING PTC ON 083121 AT 3:15PM VIA ZOOM -DTD 080221
Date: August 02, 2021INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, COLLEEN MARIE SLAVIN
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERV
Date: August 24, 2021REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PLNTF
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING TRIAL BY ZOOM UPON ALL DEFS ON 091321 FILED BY PLNTF
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME TO LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP FILED BY PLNTF
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING PTC UPON ALL DEFS ON 081121 FILED BY PLNTF
Date: August 11, 2021AMENDED WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLNTF
Date: September 30, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLNTF
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE - IN POSSESSION OF CLERK
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE - IN POSSESSION OF CLERK
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER FILED SETTING TRIAL BY ZOOM ON 110421 AT 9:45 DTD 083121
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT - IN POSSESSION OF CLERK
Date: October 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: October 25, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - DISPOSED BY NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: October 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS (BLANK)
Date: February 02, 2022RESPONSE TO ORDER TO RESPOND FILED BY PLNTF
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PLNTFS COUNSEL
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFDVT OF PLNTFS COUNSEL AND AFFDVT OF COST
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT AND DOC EVIDENCE LIST PLAINTIFF
Date: November 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF SALE 010622
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF SALE ON 010622
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: January 13, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - $205,407.75 MIN BID SALE DATE 010622 DTD 110421
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF SALE ON 010622
Date: November 29, 2021FORECLOSURE SALE BREAKDOWN
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFDVT AS TO ATTYS FEES
Date: October 29, 2021SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP
Date: February 23, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NO TENANTS FILED BY PLNTF
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE THAT PLNTF DOES NOT INTENT TO PURSUE SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: July 10, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FJ OF FORECLOSURE UPON ALL DEFS ON 110821 FILED BY PLNTF
Date: November 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR COOPER $207,128.54
Date: February 09, 2022BIDDING HISTORY FOR JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 06, 2022REQUEST FOR SURPLUS FUNDS -FILED BY DEFENDANT, COLLEEN MARIE SLAVIN
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION DTD 050222
Date: May 03, 2022ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Date: December 13, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION (BLANK)
Date: May 03, 2022WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK 050422
Date: May 04, 2022MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: April 20, 2022COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: December 05, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*
Date: December 05, 2019COVER SHEET
Date: December 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 (BLANK)
Date: December 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2
Date: December 06, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JACQUELINE MARIE SHANNON AKA JACQUELINE SHANNON
Date: December 06, 2019VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY $163,205.78
Date: December 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE MARIE SHANNON AKA JACQUELINE SHANNON (BLANK)
Date: December 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUISITION FORM - RECEIPTS 771892 & 772161 DATED 010622 & 010722 $9871.46 PLUS INT PAYABLE TO COLLEEN SLAVIN-MESZAROS | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUISITION FORM - RECEIPTS 771892 & 772161 DATED 010622 & 010722 $15.00 PAYABLE TO CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT & COMPTROLLER | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED ON REQUEST FOR SURPLUS AND ORDER CLOSING CASE - DEF COLLEEN SLAVIN MESZAROS' REQUEST FOR SURPLUS IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE REMAINING SURPLUS TO COLLEEN SLAVIN-MESZAROS DTD 083022 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopen Civil Other closed on 8/30/2022 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 083022 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM ON DEF COLLEEN SLAVIN MESZARAOS' REQUEST FOR SURPLUS FUNDS DTD 072922 | |
July 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT PLNTF DOES NOT INTENT TO PURSUE SURPLUS FUNDS | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED POSTED WRIT OF POSSEESION, ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION. COLLEEN MARIE SLAVIN 5/10/22 | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK 050422 | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION DTD 050222 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.