Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Marcotte, Jonathan, Owen, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by De Pury, Gary Charles, against Marcotte, Crystal, Marcotte, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 9/14/2023 at 1200 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY CERTIFICATE OF DEATH FILED (STEVEN MARCOTTE) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY CERTIFICATE OF DEATH FILED (CRYSTAL MARCOTTE) | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING 9/14/23 @ 12 | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Other - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 2023009614 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.