Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rodriguez, Yessenia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cardoso, Tatiana Karen, against Rodriguez Herriquez, Santos A, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $18.00 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $18.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $18.00 Receipt Number MX 2023011632 | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DOM CASES FILED | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT FOR REMOTE UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE "RUCD" | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.