Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ramirez, Alejandra Pollett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guillen Romero, Carlos Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT/COMPLIANCE REPORT | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 12/14/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SLOAN , JAMES D assigned | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 262023DR000487DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2023 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00 | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTICS FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.