Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Montoya Ramirez, Consuelo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Ramiro Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL FILED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Event NJTR scheduled on 3/19/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT/COMPLIANCE REPORT | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE RETURNED TO SENDER (CONSUELO MONTOYA RAMIREZ) | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 12/14/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: RAMIRO RAMIREZ JR (09-01-23) | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUPPORT UNCONNECTED WITH DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SLOAN , JAMES D assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.