Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Marte, Ginger, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marte, Felipe, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (RECORDED) | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELEINS WORKSHEET FILED | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (PETITIONER'S PARENTING PLAN) | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 10/17/2023 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.