Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dixon, Emmanuel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Montgomery, Thomas, against Williams, Shaquanti T, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMO INFO SHEET FILED | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IVD CASE FILED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON SUPERSEDING ORDER TO JUDICIALLY ESTABLISH CHILD SUPPORT OBLIGATION FROM ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AND FOR OTHER RELIEF AND ORDER FILED AND RECORDED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER FILED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT FILED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED: (08-1-23@3:30PM) | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 8/1/2023 at 0330 AM, MX - Judge HOWARD ATKIN presiding. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED (06-06-23@1:00PM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.