Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Campbell Cooke, Patsy Joan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martin, Christopher Adrian, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $17.00 | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $17.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $17.00 Receipt Number MX 2023004124 | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 3/16/2023 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2023002007 | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTICS FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.