Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Martinez, Janet, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baltazar, Marino, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON CHILD SUPPORT FILED AND RECORDED | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT HISTORY FILED | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 11/7/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge HOWARD ATKIN presiding. | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (11-07-23@1:30PM) | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR NON SUSPENSION OF DRIVER LICENSE FILED | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 9/18/2023 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CC OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE PATERNITY AND SUPPORT ORDER FILED AND RECORDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.