Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martinez, Jose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sierra, Aracelis, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEPARTMENT OF REVENUES MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED | |
September 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO DEPARTMENT OF REVENUES MOTION TO INTERVENUE FILED | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY TIMESHARING | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HR on 7/18/2023 0130 PM Judge ROBERT OSTROV results Cancelled on 7/13/2023 | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: SET FOR 7/18/23 @ 1:30 | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERT OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS FILED (JOSE MARTINEZ) | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 7/18/2023 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT EXHIBIT D (ADMITTED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.