Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martinez Gomez, Salvador, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno Arias, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE RETURNED TO SENDER (ELIZABETH MORENO ARIA) | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 4/11/2023 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE SET FOR 4/11/23 @ 11:30 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SLOAN , JAMES D assigned | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 262023DR000019DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2023 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INIDIGENT STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.