Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Albor, Mayoli Ericka, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia Garcia, Jose Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $2.00 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $4.00 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008940 | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (RECORDED) | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 8/29/2022 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge JAMES SLOAN presiding. | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 8/29/22 @ 10:45 (ZOOM) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PREEMPTORY OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.