Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gongora, Blanca Lesly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Monteagudo Cordero, Rafael, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HR on 4/11/2023 0900 AM Judge ROBERT OSTROV results Cancelled on 4/12/2023 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED CARLOS M RIPPES ESQ/PETITIONER | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 4/11/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTICATE OF COMPLIANCE W/MANDATORY DISCLOSURE (RAFAEL MONTEAGUDO) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.