Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Santiago, Ruberto Cuevas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cabai, Jill Elizabeth, against Santiago, Ana Maria Pagan, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN AND RESPONDENT'S LAST NAME RESTORED | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $60.00 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2023005295 | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION FILED MEDIATION FEE | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING AND DIRECTING SCHEDULED MEDIATION | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER MEDIATION FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.